Mix v. Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William Mix
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Servicing Inc and Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00699
Filed: May 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's 24 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER striking Defendant's 14 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Defendant Ocwen to show cause why the court should not deny it's pending motion to dismiss as moot 14 . Ocwen to respond to court's order in its reply brief which is due 7/28/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 Stipulated Motion to extend time to file a response to complaint; time extended to 6/30/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting parties' 4 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Complaint; Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC and Ocwen Mortgage Servicing Inc answer due 6/16/2017, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mix v. Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mix
Represented By: Sarah T McEahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Servicing Inc
Represented By: Timothy Irving Kahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Timothy Irving Kahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?