Mikelsen et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Alice Mikelsen and Susan Page
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Asbestos Corp., Ltd, CBS Corporation, Crane Co, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., IMO Industries Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Saberhagen Holdings, Inc., The William Powell Company, Uniroyal Inc, Warren Pumps LLC and Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00700
Filed: May 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Kitsap
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Parties' 138 Stipulation: Plaintiffs' claims and causes of action against Warren Pumps, LLC only, are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing all claims against defendant General Electric Company with prejudice and without costs to any party re parties' 132 Stipulation filed, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (General Electric Company terminated.)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED without prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting in part plaintiffs' 86 Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Certain Affirmative Defenses, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing with prejudice plaintiff's claims against defendant Air Liquid Systems Corporation re parties' 119 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Air & Liquid Systems Corporation terminated.)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing defendant IMO Industries Inc re parties' 99 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (IMO Industries Inc terminated)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting plaintiff's 96 Motion to Extend Deadline; Discovery deadline is extended to 6/13/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting parties' 92 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date and Related Deadlines. The trial date is continued to November 5, 2018. The parties' dispositive motions, Dkt. ## 86 , 87 , are renoted to June 22, 2018. Plaintiff may list Dr. Carl Brodkin as an expert witness. His export report shall be produced no later than July 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER to RENOTE plaintiff's 73 MOTION to Compel IMO Industries Inc.'s Discovery Responses : Noting Date 2/16/2018; re parties' 82 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel re Chris marks and Erin Fraser's 66 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant Uniroyal, Inc. re parties' 67 Stipulation; all claims against Uniroyal, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)(Uniroyal Inc terminated.)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Deadline for Disclosure of Expert Informaiton re parties' 49 Stipulation; Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/20/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal as to Defendant William Powell Company re parties' 46 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (The William Powell Company terminated.)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Defendant Weir Vales & Controls USA, Inc. re parties' 44 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. terminated.)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER dismissing claims against Defendant Saberhagen Holdings, Inc. re Defendant Saberhagen Holdings, Inc.'s 40 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)(Saberhagen Holdings, Inc. terminated.)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Deadline for Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1); re parties' 22 Stipulation ; Initial Disclosure Deadline is CONTINUED for seven (7) until 6/12/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mikelsen et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Mikelsen
Represented By: Thomas J. Breen
Represented By: Lucas W.H. Garrett
Represented By: Kristin M Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Page
Represented By: Thomas J. Breen
Represented By: Lucas W.H. Garrett
Represented By: Kristin M Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Barry Neal Mesher
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbestos Corp., Ltd
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Represented By: G William Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc.
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: James Edward Horne
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard G Gawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saberhagen Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Kost Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: James D Hicks
Represented By: Brian Bernard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal Inc
Represented By: Chris Robert Youtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?