Johnson v. The Boeing Company et al
Plaintiff: Ralph G. Johnson
Defendant: The Boeing Company and Barbara Wiley
Case Number: 2:2017cv00706
Filed: May 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice and Without Costs re parties' 49 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying without prejudice plaintiff counsel's 47 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying Plaintiff Ralph G. Johnsons' 24 Motion to Disqualify Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Barbara Wiley's 22 Motion to Dismiss; The defamation and intentional infliction of emotional distress claims against defendant Wiley are hereby DISMISSED. Plaintiff may proceed with his negligent infliction of emotional distress claim. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re parties' 36 MOTION to Approve Stipulated Protective Order, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 13 Stipulated Motion; Deadline for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED to 6/30/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER vacating Order Regarding Initial Disclosures, Joint Status Report and Early Settlement, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. The Boeing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph G. Johnson
Represented By: Gregory A McBroom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?