Northwest Immigrant Rights Project et al v. Sessions, III et al
Plaintiff: Northwest Immigrant Rights Project and Yuk Man Maggie Cheng
Defendant: Jefferson B Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Juan Osuna and Jennifer Barnes
Amicus: Attorney General of Washington and American Civil Liberties Union of Washington (ACLU)
Case Number: 2:2017cv00716
Filed: May 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Government's 67 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(TH)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying Defendants' 69 Motion to Stay signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(PM)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting plaintiffs' 37 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting the Immigration Reform Law Institute's 62 Motion to file an amicus brief, signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality's 40 Motion for leave to file brief as amicus curiae; denying AILA's 41 Motion for leave to file brief as amicus curiae signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying non party organizations' 28 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 2 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting American Civil Liberties Union of Washington's 20 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae, by Judge Richard A Jones. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Immigrant Rights Project et al v. Sessions, III et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Glenda Melinda Aldana Madrid
Represented By: Jaime Drozd Allen
Represented By: James Harlan Corning
Represented By: Leila Kang
Represented By: Robert E Miller
Represented By: Michele Radosevich
Represented By: Laura-Lee S Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuk Man Maggie Cheng
Represented By: Jaime Drozd Allen
Represented By: James Harlan Corning
Represented By: Robert E Miller
Represented By: Michele Radosevich
Represented By: Laura-Lee S Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B Sessions, III
Represented By: Victor M. Mercado-Santana
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Gladys M. Steffens Guzman
Represented By: Gisela A Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Victor M. Mercado-Santana
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Gladys M. Steffens Guzman
Represented By: Gisela A Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By: Victor M. Mercado-Santana
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Gladys M. Steffens Guzman
Represented By: Gisela A Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Osuna
Represented By: Victor M. Mercado-Santana
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Gladys M. Steffens Guzman
Represented By: Gisela A Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Barnes
Represented By: Victor M. Mercado-Santana
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Gladys M. Steffens Guzman
Represented By: Gisela A Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Attorney General of Washington
Represented By: Patricio A. Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: American Civil Liberties Union of Washington (ACLU)
Represented By: Michael J Ewart
Represented By: Andrew Garcia Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?