Alaska Growth Capital BIDCO, Inc. v. Klawock Oceanside Inc
Plaintiff: Alaska Growth Capital BIDCO, Inc.
Defendant: Klawock Oceanside Inc, Laurence E. Lang, Mary L. Lang, Carson V. Lang and AKUTAN
Case Number: 2:2017cv00734
Filed: May 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0961
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Stipulated Motion staying case and directing clerk to enter a statistical termination signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER STRIKING NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL AND REINSTATING COUNSEL by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting plaintiff's 3 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS) cc cert copies to USMO
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying plaintiff's 2 Motion to Arrest Vessel; denying as moot plaintiff's 3 Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alaska Growth Capital BIDCO, Inc. v. Klawock Oceanside Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Growth Capital BIDCO, Inc.
Represented By: John E. Casperson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klawock Oceanside Inc
Represented By: R Isaak Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurence E. Lang
Represented By: R Isaak Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary L. Lang
Represented By: R Isaak Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carson V. Lang
Represented By: R Isaak Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKUTAN
Represented By: R Isaak Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?