Bracken et al v. State of Washington Department of Corrections Medical et al
Plaintiff: Travis D Bracken
Defendant: State of Washington Department of Corrections Medical, Crystal, Jennifer, Christinsey and Care Review Committee
Case Number: 2:2017cv00736
Filed: May 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADOPTING 21 Report and Recommendation. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The motion to compel discovery is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. Mail)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER Discovery completed by 11/8/2017, Dispositive motions due by 12/8/2017, by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (RS) cc plaintiff
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND PROCEDURES by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Served by E-Service on 5/18/17 to Department of Corrections Medical Department; Crystal (LNU); Jennifer (LNU); PA Christinsey; Care Review Committee.**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Travis Bracken, Prisoner ID: 735041)(ST)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bracken et al v. State of Washington Department of Corrections Medical et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis D Bracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington Department of Corrections Medical
Represented By: Newell David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christinsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Review Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?