Heinz v. Immigration Custom Enforcement ICE-DHS
Petitioner: Rupff Heinz
Respondent: Immigration Custom Enforcement ICE-DHS
Case Number: 2:2017cv00761
Filed: May 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 27 Report and Recommendations; Petitioner's habeas petition is DENIED as moot; all pending motions (dkts. 3 , 12 , 18 ) are denied as moot; this action is dismissed without prejudice, signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (SWT) (cc: Petitioner via USPS)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER directing the Government to inform the Court, by October 17, 2017, whether petitioner has received a custody hearing; directing the Clerk to RE-NOTE pending motions 3 , 18 , 12 : Noting Date 10/17/2017, by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (SWT) (cc: Petitioner via USPS)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR RETURN AND STATUS REPORT § 2241 PETITION by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Electronic posting of this Order shall affect service on the United States Attorney and respondent(s). Within 30 days of the date this Order is posted, respondent(s ) shall show cause why a writ of habeas corpus should not be granted by filing a return as provided in 28 U.S.C. § 2243. In accordance with LCR 7, respondent(s) shall note their return for consideration on the fourth Friday after it is filed. Petitioner may file and serve a response not later than the Monday immediately preceding the Friday appointed for consideration of the matter. Respondent(s) may file and serve a reply brief not later than the Friday designated for consideration of the matter. (cc: petitioner)(ST)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heinz v. Immigration Custom Enforcement ICE-DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rupff Heinz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration Custom Enforcement ICE-DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?