Holley v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Eugene Holley
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2017cv00771
Filed: May 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CORRECTED ORDER granting Plaintiff's 37 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under EAJA. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Attorney Fees Under EAJA signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ADOPTING 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This matter is REVERSED and REMANDED to the Commissioner for further consideration. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (SWT)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Amending the Scheduling Order re Defendant's 28 Motion to Amend. Defendant shall have up to and including August 27, 2018, to file objections to this Court Report and Recommendation; and Plaintiff shall have up to and including September 10, 2018, to file a Reply. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response/Opening Brief due by 12/29/2017, Responsive Brief due by 1/26/2018, Reply Brief due by 2/9/2018 - by Judge J Richard Creatura. (SH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holley v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Holley
Represented By: Harvey S. Grad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?