Moore v. The Boeing Company et al

Plaintiff: Lisa Moore
Defendant: The Boeing Company and Does
Case Number: 2:2017cv00800
Filed: May 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Trial Continuance and New Scheduling Order re parties' 86 Stipulation: Jury Trial is set for 8/24/2020. Expert Discovery Cutoff is 4/10/2020, Motions related to expert witnesses due by 4/23/2020, Motions due by 2/6/2020, Discovery completed by 3/12/2020, Dispositive motions due by 4/16/2020, Motions in Limine due by 7/23/2020, Pretrial Order due by 8/7/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 15206 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 3/26/2020, Trial briefs to be submitted by 8/7/2020, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 8/7/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER granting 78 , 79 Unopposed Motions to Withdraw as Attorney; denying plaintiff's request that the Court not enter an order permitting withdrawal until she locates appropriate replacement counsel, (dkt.no. 80 ). Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Attorneys Gregory L. Young, Steve Haney and Reba Weiss terminated.) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting parties' 76 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date and Extend Existing Pretrial Deadlines as follows: Jury Trial is set for 11/4/2019 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)( 2) due by 8/9/2019, Motions related to expert witnesses due by 8/22/2019, Discovery completed by 7/8/2019, Dispositive motions due by 8/8/2019, Motions in Limine due by 10/1/2019, Pretrial Order due by 10/15/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 11:00 AM. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 7/26/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/15/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/15/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 69 Motion for Protective Order; denying as premature Plaintiff's 69 motion for exclusion of Jones as a trial witness. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 58 Stipulated Motion Seeking Adjustment to Trial Calendar: Jury Trial is set for 6/17/2019. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/29/2019, Motions due by 1/17/2019, Discovery co mpleted by 2/25/2019, Dispositive motions due by 3/28/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2018, 39.1 Settlement Report due by 1/31/2019, Motions in Limine due by 5/16/2019, Pretrial Order due by 5/31/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 6 /7/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 3/15/2019, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 12/31/2018, Trial briefs to be submitted by 5/31/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 5/31/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 55 Stipulated Motion to Amend. The Order entered August 29, 2018, docket no. 53 , is AMENDED as follows. (See Minute Order for details). Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting defendant's 45 Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff Lisa Moore. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER continuing settlement conference and mediation deadlines re parties' 43 Stipulated Motion ; 39.1 mediation to be completed by 1/31/2019, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 12/31/2018, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 37 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date and Related Pretrial Deadlines: Jury Trial is RESET to 3/11/2019. Discovery completed by 6/29/2018, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 1/15/2019, Exp ert Discovery Cutoff is 1/31/2019, Dispositive motions due by 11/15/2018, Motions in Limine due by 2/7/2019, Pretrial Order due by 2/22/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 2/22/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 2/22/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER denying plaintiff's 32 Stipulated Motion for Substitution of Attorney. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting parties' 26 Stipulated Motion to Continue Deadlines for Expert Disclosures: Expert Witness Disclosure due by 3/5/2018, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 3/26/2018, Expert Discovery Cut-Off date is 4/9/2018, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND RELATED DATES: Jury Trial (5-10 days) is set for 8/17/2018 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. 39.1 mediation to be completed by 7/6/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 2/5/2018, Discovery completed by 5/7/2018, Dis positive motions due by 6/7/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 2/5/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 9/15/2017, Motions due by 3/29/2018, Motions in Limine due by 7/26/2018, Pretrial Order due by 8/10/2018, At torney settlement conference to be held by 6/8/2018, Trial briefs to be submitted by 8/10/2018, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 8/10/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting parties' 14 Stipulated Motion; deadline for Defendant's to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 7/5/2017. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. The Boeing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Moore
Represented By: Steve Haney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Lauren D Parris Watts
Represented By: Gregory Young(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Karen Y Cho(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Laurence A Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?