Rowe v. Trenary et al
Plaintiff: Michael C Rowe
Defendant: Ty Trenary, Sonya Kraski and Briels
Case Number: 2:2017cv00805
Filed: May 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING 36 Report and Recommendation. Defendant's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. 26 ) is GRANTED, and plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment (Dkt. 30 ) is DENIED; Plaintiff's amended complaint (Dkt. 11 ) and this action are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Rowe, Prisoner ID: 285852) (TH)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS FROM CIVIL RIGHTS ACTION by Judge Richard A Jones. The Report and Recommendation is approved. Plaintiff's amended complaint (Dkt# 11) and this action are DISMISSED without prejudice as to defendants Ty Trenary, J. Tayler, John Doe Correctional Officerse, John Doe Medical Administrator and the John Doe Bothell Police Department for failure of plaintiff to adequately allege any claim upon which relief may be granted in this civil rights action. Plaintiff's amended complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice as to defendants Sonya Kraski and John Doe Clerk's Office Employee as those defendants are immune from liability in this civil rights action. Judge Theiler shall issue a service order directing service of plaintiff's amended complaint on defendant Bothell Police Officer Briels. (cc: plaintiff)(ST)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Plaintiff's request for extension to file amended complaint is STRICKEN as moot. Plaintiff's request for copies of individual rules and local rules is DENIED. (cc: plaintiff)(ST)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DECLINING TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: plaintiff with Amended 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form)(ST)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowe v. Trenary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Trenary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Kraski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?