Milestone Condominium Association v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Milestone Condominium Association
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company and Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Case Number: 2:2017cv00832
Filed: May 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Protective Order Barring State Farm's Deposition of Keith Soltner, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Stipulated Motion continuing the deadline for Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) from 2/21/2018 to 3/16/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting plaintiff's 5 Motion to Continue Deadlines; FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/28/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/4/2017, Joint Status Report due by 8/11/2017, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milestone Condominium Association v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milestone Condominium Association
Represented By: Jessica Burns
Represented By: Justin D Sudweeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?