US Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Pishon Holding LLC et al
Plaintiff: US Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Pishon Holding LLC, Sung Hong and Hyun Joo Hong
Case Number: 2:2017cv00847
Filed: June 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 07:0006
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 67 Motion for Default Judgment, Permanent Injunction, and Ancillary Equitable Relief Against Defendants Pishon Holding, LLC, Sung Hong, and Hyun Joo Hong. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(TH) (cc: Defendant Hyun Joo Hong via USPS)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 65 Joint Status Report. The Court hereby ORDERS that any Motion for Default Judgment be filed within thirty days of the date of this order. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH) (cc: Defendant Hyun Joo Hong via first class mail)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting Perkins Coie LLP's 51 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Hyun Joo Hong. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SWT)(Attorney Thomas W Hillier terminated) (cc: Hyun Hong via USPS)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 47 Motion to Lift Stay due to resolution of parallel criminal proceedings signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 39 Motion for Relief from Stay as to Defendant Grace Hong; granting Plaintiff's 40 Motion to Set Aside Default as to Defendants Pishon and Laurence Hong; granting Plaintiff's 41 Motion to Amend Complaint, signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT) Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint.
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 36 Motion to Strike Notice of Claim. It is ordered that the Notice of Claim 35 be STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(PM)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 31 Motion to Set Aside Default and Stay Proceedings signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(lp)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT ORDER OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIOIN AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF granting 16 Unopposed MOTION Entry of Consent Order as to Defendant Lawrence Hong. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER authorized by Judge James L. Robart. Defendants Pishon Holding LLC, Laurence Hong, and Grace Hong's responses, if any, to the CFTC's motion for a preliminary injunction, are due no later than Monday, June 19, 2017, at 12:00 p.m. The CFTC's reply, if any, is due no later than Thursday, June 22, 2017, at 12:00 p.m. (PM)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 8 Motion to Continue Show Cause Hearing; Show Cause Hearing is rescheduled for 6/26/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart. The court extends the statutory restraining order 5 to 6/29/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 6 Motion to Unseal Case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Pishon Holding LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Kim G. Bruno
Represented By: Ilana D. Waxman
Represented By: Alison B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pishon Holding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sung Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyun Joo Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?