Gomes v. The Boeing Company
Plaintiff: Gregory Gomes
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv00864
Filed: June 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 10 Motion for Reconsideration filed as Reply to Response to Motion, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing complaint with prejudice and without leave to amend. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via the U.S. Mail
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the court should not dismiss this case; Show Cause Response due by 7/11/2017, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomes v. The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?