Nellams v. Pacific Maritime Association et al
Plaintiff: Abin'Bola Nellams
Defendant: Pacific Maritime Association, SSA Marine, Inc., Total Terminals International, LLC, International Longshoremen's & Ware-Housemen's Union, Local 19 and Faron Fletcher
Case Number: 2:2017cv00911
Filed: June 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 05:7703
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 88 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant SSA Marine, Inc. All of Plaintiff's remaining claims are DISMISSED. All other pending motions are STRICKEN as MOOT, signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(LW)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing with prejudice all claims by Plaintiff against Defendant Pacific Maritime Association re parties' 94 Joint Motion, signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT) (Pacific Maritime Association terminated.)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 84 Stipulated Motion and Order for Dismissal of Pacific Maritime Association. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 82 directing Defendant to file a redacted version of Exhibit L to the Declaration of Aileen Pick (Dkt. # 80 ) that redacts the identifying information of non-parties (names, employee numbers, etc.). Exhibit L to the Declaration of Aileen Pick (Dkt. # 80 ) shall REMAIN UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Defendant, within five days of this Order, why the Court should not unseal Exhibit L to the Declaration of Aileen Pick (Dkt. 80 ). Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying Defendant Pacific Maritime Association's 75 Stipulated Motion for Leave to File Overlength Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting parties' 73 Stipulated Motion. It is ORDERED that the date for filing motions related to discovery is extended from 7/13/2018 to 7/27/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION ORDER for Continuance re parties' 71 Stipulated Motion; Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/13/2018, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re 69 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal of Total Terminals, International LLC. All claims against Defendant Total Terminals International LLC are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(PM)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 65 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying Defendant TTI's 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; and granting Plaintiff Nellams' 31 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the Proposed Second Amended Complaint, Dkt. #31-1, and serve it on Defendants within fourteen (14) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying defendant Faron Fletcher's 38 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 14 Stipulated Motion for continuance of initial deadlines signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nellams v. Pacific Maritime Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abin'Bola Nellams
Represented By: Stephanie Henderson Stocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Maritime Association
Represented By: Clemens H Barnes
Represented By: Megan L Starich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA Marine, Inc.
Represented By: Richard P. Lentini
Represented By: James M. Shaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Terminals International, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Clayton Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshoremen's & Ware-Housemen's Union, Local 19
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faron Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?