CyWee Group Ltd. v. HTC Corporation et al
Plaintiff: CyWee Group Ltd.
Defendant: HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00932
Filed: June 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting Third-Party Defendant CyWee Motion Group Ltd's 141 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(MW)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting parties' 135 Stipulated Motion to Seal. CyWee's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 136 ) shall be filed under seal. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding combined and extended briefing schedule re parties' 127 Stipulated Motion: RENOTING CyWee's 123 MOTION to Stay (Partial), and HTC's 126 CROSS-MOTION : Noting Date 4/5/2019, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting parties' 124 Stipulated Motion to Postpone Claim Construction Dates; vacating the deadline to submit responsive claim construction briefs; striking the Markman hearing, currently scheduled for 4/19/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting parties' 121 stipulated motion for extension of time to submit responsive claim construction briefs. Responsive claim construction briefs due 3/15/2019, Markman Hearing is RESCHEDULED for 4/19/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting defendants and third-party plaintiffs' 111 Motion to Seal. Dkt. 113 shall remain under seal. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER re: parties' 114 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for CyWee's Reply to the 107 MOTION for Summary Judgment is extended to 1/4/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting Third-Party Defendant's 105 Motion to Seal. Accordingly, 106 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Michael Shore in support CyWee's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed under seal. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Amend Scheduling Order re parties' 100 Stipulation. Joint claim chart due 1/4/2019, Opening claim construction briefs due 1/31/2019, Responsive claim construction briefs due 2/28/2019, Markman Hearing se t for 3/29/2019 at 9:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart, Amended Pleadings due by 5/9/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/21/2019, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 6/6/2019, Discovery completed by 6/18/2019, Dispositive motions due by 7/2/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 97 Stipulated Motion and Order to Amend Scheduling Order. The court GRANTS the parties' request and thus VACATES the current schedule. (See Am. Sched. Order (Dkt. # 73 ).) Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 95 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER per the 93 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Party, all claims against STMicroelectronics N.V., ST Inc., and STMicroelectronics Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd. as asserted by HTC in the Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. # 43 ) are dismissed with prejudice; HTC's 87 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Third-Party Complaint is withdrawn; ST Inc.'s 90 Motion for Sanctions is withdrawn. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting Defendants and Third-Party Plaintiffs' 83 Motion to Seal, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying Plaintiff CyWee Group Ltd's 76 Motion to Preclude Consideration of Belated Claims Construction Positions, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting third-party Defendant STMicroelectronics' 64 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Third-party plaintiffs HTC Corporation's and HTC America, Inc.'s claims against ST Inc. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER AFFIRMING Amendment to Scheduling Order. The court GRANTS HTC's request to amend the scheduling order (Dkt. # 68 ). The new deadlines, as proposed by HTC, can be found at docket entry # 73 . Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 AMENDMENT TO SCHEDULING ORDER granting Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiffs HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc.'s 68 Motion to Amend. Jury Trial is set for 3/25/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James L. Robart; Joint claim chart and Prehear ing Statement due 7/27/2018, Opening claim construction briefs due 8/2/2018, Responsive claim construction briefs due 8/16/2018, Markman Hearing set for 9/21/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart; Initial Reports from expert witness es regarding Markman issues due 10/23/2018; Rebuttal expert reports regarding Markman issues due 11/8/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 11/13/2018, Discovery completed by 11/19/2018, Dispositive motions due by 11/20/2018, Attorney s ettlement conference to be held by 12/21/2018, Motions in Limine due by 2/22/2019, Pretrial Order due by 3/7/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 3/18/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting Defendants HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc.'s 35 Motion to Dismiss. The court DISMISSES CyWee's induced infringement claims without prejudice and GRANTS CyWee leave to amend those claims within ten (10) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 51 Stipulated Motion Approving Extension for Third-Party Defendant STMicroelectronics, Inc. to Respond to Third-Party Complaint. STMicroelectronics, lnc.'s deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint is March 26, 2018, Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 Stipulated Motion to Amend Initial Scheduling Dates. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/2/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/16/2017, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 11/23/2017, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 22 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. HTC Corporation and HTC America Inc.'s deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint is October 26, 2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 18 Stipulation ; deadline for HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED to 9/26/2017, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CyWee Group Ltd. v. HTC Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CyWee Group Ltd.
Represented By: Paul T Beeler(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Timothy J Billick
Represented By: Carmen E. Bremer
Represented By: Alfonso G. Chan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Christopher L. Evans(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David Allen Lowe
Represented By: Ari Rafilson(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michael W Shore(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?