Steele et al v. Seattle Theatre Group et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Steele and Rhonda Brown
Defendant: Seattle Theatre Group, Neptune Building LLC, Moore Hotel, Inc and RB-WW Seattle LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00939
Filed: June 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting parties' 55 Stipulated Motion to Amend Judgment. The remainder of the terms in the prior judgment (Dkt. No. 39 ) are unchanged. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 42 Motion for Attorney Fees, signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER terminating Plaintiffs' 40 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiffs shall refile their motion in accordance with the Local Civil Rules. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 37 Notice of Plaintiffs' acceptance of an offer of judgment. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Plaintiffs' pending motions to compel (Dkt. Nos. 27 , 28 ) as moot. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants shall file a consolidated response to Plaintiffs' motions to compel (Dkt. Nos. 27 and 28 ). The response shall be filed no later than May 7, 2018. Plaintiffs shall file one reply to Defendants' response no later than May 11, 2018. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-note Plaintiffs' first motion to compel (Dkt. No. 27 ) to May 11, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 20 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER on First Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, to Dismiss Neptune Building LLC without Prejudice and Without Fees or Costs to Either Pa rty, and Acceptance of Service of Process. The attorneys for Plaintiff and Defendants stipulate and agree that: (1) Counsel for Plaintiff may file without opposition the attached First Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint For Declaratory a nd Injunctive Relief with the Clerk of the Court; and (2) Defendant, The Neptune Building, LLC, is hereby DISMISSED from this action without prejudice and without an award of fees or costs to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 18 Stipulation to Dismiss Plaintiff Sarah Steele with Prejudice and Without Fees or Costs to Any Party . Plaintiff Sarah Steele is DISMISSED from this action with prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to any party. Future filings in this case shall be captioned: Rhonda Brown v. Seattle Theatre Group, et al. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 13 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendants to File Answer to Complaint; The Defendants must file their answer by October 6, 2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Stipulated Motion to extend Defendants' deadline to file an answer to the complaint; answer due by 8/24/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER dismissing Defendant RB-WW Seattle LLC without prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to either party re parties' 7 Stipulation. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT) (RB-WW Seattle LLC terminated.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele et al v. Seattle Theatre Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Steele
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Represented By: Mark D Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Brown
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Represented By: Mark D Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Theatre Group
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Represented By: Charles P Rullman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neptune Building LLC
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Represented By: Charles P Rullman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore Hotel, Inc
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Represented By: Charles P Rullman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RB-WW Seattle LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?