Boards of Trustees of the Northwest Ironworkers Health and Security Fund et al v. North Coast Iron Corp et al
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the Northwest Ironworkers Health and Security Fund, Northwest Ironworkers Employers Vacation Trust, Northwest Ironworkers Retirement Trust, Northwest Field Ironworkers Annuity Trust Fund and Northwest Ironworkers & Employers Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund
Defendant: North Coast Iron Corp, M.A. Mortenson Company, Federal Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America and Western Washington University
Case Number: 2:2017cv00945
Filed: June 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 16 Stipulation treated as a Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Against North Coast Iron without Prejudice; directing the Clerk to CLOSE this case. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER extending deadline for North Coast Iron Corp to file a responsive pleading or motion to October 10, 2017; re parties' 14 Stipulation, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER pursuant to parties' 10 Stipulation; the deadline for defendants to file a responsive pleading or motion is EXTENDED to 9/27/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend deadline for Defendant North Coast Iron Corp to file Answer to Complaint re parties' 6 Stipulation ; North Coast Iron Corp responsive pleading or motion due 9/27/2017, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boards of Trustees of the Northwest Ironworkers Health and Security Fund et al v. North Coast Iron Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the Northwest Ironworkers Health and Security Fund
Represented By: Noelle E. Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Ironworkers Employers Vacation Trust
Represented By: Noelle E. Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Ironworkers Retirement Trust
Represented By: Noelle E. Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Field Ironworkers Annuity Trust Fund
Represented By: Noelle E. Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Ironworkers & Employers Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Noelle E. Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Coast Iron Corp
Represented By: Mark J Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.A. Mortenson Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Washington University
Represented By: Robert Erwin Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?