Linden et al v. X2 Biosystems, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Charles Linden and Ronald Lander
Defendant: X2 Biosystems, Inc, John Wu, Christopher Siege and Brian Flaim
Case Number: 2:2017cv00966
Filed: June 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 121 Motion for Attorney Fees Costs and Disbursements. The Court AWARDS Defendant X2 Biosystems, Inc. a total of $8,579.85 (attorneys' fees of $7,903.71 and costs and disbursements of $676.14). Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting in part and deferring in part Defendants' 121 Post-Final Judgment Rule 54 Motion for Fees, Costs, and Disbursements; directing parties to meet and confer within seven (7) days of this Order; RENOTING Defendants' 121 Post-Final Judgment Rule 54 Motion for Fees, Costs, and Disbursements for 5/3/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 93 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; Second Amended Complaint due within seven (7) days of this Order; finding as moot Defendants' 84 Motion to Dismiss. Joint Status Report due no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 91 Motion to Seal. Exhibits D, E, F, G and I to the Declaration of Michelle Sanfro (Dkt. # 95 ) shall REMAIN UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying without prejudice Defendants' 74 Motion for Attorney Fees, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Defendants' Motion to Strike or Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Motion to Dismiss to be filed on 6/5/2018 with a noting date of 7/13/2018; Response due 7/9/2018; Reply due 7/13/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 72 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting Defendants' 55 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, with leave to amend; denying as moot Plaintiffs' 47 Second Motion to Compel; denying as moot Defendants' 51 Motion for Relief from Discovery Deadline. Plaintiffs may file an Amended Complaint no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Postponed Depositions of Non-Party Witness and Plaintiffs re parties' 67 Stipulation, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Postponed Deposition of Nonparty Witness. The parties have agreed to postpone the deposition of Stephen Layfield until sometime between May 7 and 11, 2018 so that Plaintiffs' counsel can attend the deposition of Stephen Layfield. Furthermore, the parties stipulate to an extension of the discovery cut-off in this action for the sole purpose of allowing the deposition of Stephen Layfield to occur no later than May 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying Defendants' 57 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order Staying Discovery on an Interim Basis Pending Decision on Motion for Stay of Discovery. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 44 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' 28 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting parties' 12 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines for Answers, Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report : Christopher Siege, John Wu, X2 Biosystems, Inc answers due 8/11/2017; Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/14/2017, Joint Status Report due by 8/21/2017, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linden et al v. X2 Biosystems, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Linden
Represented By: Christie J Fix
Represented By: Michelle Safro Smith(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lander
Represented By: Christie J Fix
Represented By: Michelle Safro Smith(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X2 Biosystems, Inc
Represented By: Skylar A Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wu
Represented By: Skylar A Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Siege
Represented By: Daniel P Hurley
Represented By: Todd L Nunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Flaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?