Downey v. Andrews M.D. et al
Plaintiff: Dylan James Downey
Defendant: Stuart Andrews M.D., Alta Langdon, Tony Aston and Snohomish County
Case Number: 2:2017cv00968
Filed: June 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Presiding Judge: James P. Donohue
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MINUTE ORDER dismissing action with prejudice per parties' 90 Stipulated Motion. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT within 14 days that addresses whether there are any outstanding matters to be resolved by the undersigned before the referral is terminated and a trial is scheduled before the Honorable John C. Coughenour. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TH)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting parties' 83 Stipulated Motion Amending Pretrial Schedule. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/12/2019, Discovery completed by 4/30/2019, Dispositive motions due by 5/31/2019, signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (TH)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting parties' 80 Stipulated Motion: Plaintiff shall file third amended complaint within seven days of the date of this Order. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (SWT)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting parties' 77 Stipulated Motion to Amend Pre-Trial Schedule. The Court ORDERS the parties to complete discovery by February 28, 2019, and file dispositive motions by April 18, 2019. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (TH)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER ADOPTING 63 Report and Recommendation. Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 55 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff may proceed on his medical care claims against Defendants. All remaining claims against Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice and without leave to amend. Defendants' motion to strike (Dkt. No. 61 ) is DENIED as moot. This matter is RE-REFERRED to Judge Donohue for further proceedings. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER denying Defendants' 66 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's response. In addition, and more importantly, Defendants were not entitled to file a reply brief in this matter. Accordingly, Defendants' request for additional time to file a reply is DENIED. Defendants shall comply with the Local Civil Rules in all future filings. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff filed a pro se Motion for Leave to Respond to Interrogatories, Dkt. 49 , before he received notice that the Court appointed counsel to represent him, Dkt. 43 . Given that he is now represented by counsel, the pro se motion, Dkt. 49 , is STRICKEN. Authorized by Hon. James P. Donohue. (TH)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. Within 14 days of the date this Order is signed, the parties shall file a joint stipulation informing the Court whether or not they agree to consent to the assignment of this case to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. If both parties do not wis h to consent, they should not disclose their individual positions to the Court. Within 30 days of the date this Order is signed, plaintiff may file a second amended complaint. If plaintiff does not intend to amend, he should inform the Court as soon as possible and, in any event, no later than the deadline for amending. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (TH)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO IDENTIFY PRO BONO COUNSEL. Plaintiff's 20 MOTION for Reconsideration is GRANTED contingent upon the identification of counsel willing to represent plaintiff in this matter. Plaintiff's 30 MOTION for Leave to file Amended Complaint is DENIED without prejudice to filing a new motion to amend after counsel has been appointed. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (TH) (cc: Sharon Haas via e-mail; Plaintiff via U.S. Mail)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Directing Response to Plaintiff's 20 MOTION for Reconsideration. The Court ORDERS defendants to file a response to plaintiff's motion for reconsideration and request for appointment of counsel by September 27, 2017. Plaintiff may file an optional reply by October 6, 2017; Plaintiff's motion is re-noted for 10/6/2017. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (TH) (cc; Plaintiff via U.S. Mail)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT re: Amended Complaint, by 1st Class Mail; mailed on 8/11/2017 to Nikki Behner, Deborah Bellinger, Corrections Major Kane. Signed by Judge James P. Donohue. (PM) cc: plaintiff and Snohomish County Prosecutor's Office via 1st Class Mail
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting plaintiff's 4 Motion for leave to amend his complaint within 30 days signed by Hon. James P. Donohue.(RS) cc plaintiff, Snohomish County Pros Office
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SUBSTITUTING PROPER DEFENDANT AND DIRECTING PERSONAL SERVICE BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Hon. James P. Donohue. Packet placed in U.S. Marshals' mailbox on 7/11/17. (cc: plaintiff; Snohomish County Prosecutor's Office)(ST)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downey v. Andrews M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan James Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Andrews M.D.
Represented By: Marc Bides
Represented By: Michael C Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alta Langdon
Represented By: Marc Bides
Represented By: Michael C Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Aston
Represented By: Marc Bides
Represented By: Michael C Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County
Represented By: Marc Bides
Represented By: Michael C Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?