Jennings(s) v. Duke Partners II, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Suzanne Jennings(s)
Defendant: Duke Partners II, LLC, Breckenridge Property Fund, LLC, Wedgewood, LLC(s), Tyrus Parker, Rebecca Shrader, AFRCT Law Firm and Wells Fargo
Case Number: 2:2017cv00969
Filed: June 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER dismissing this matter without prejudice for failure to comply with the orders of this Court, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing parties to file their Joint Status Report and show cause to the Court by 1/5/2018 why sanctions including dismissal should not be imposed for their failure to comply with the Order of November 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying plaintiff's 10 MOTION to Remand / MOTION for Severence, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER imposing sanctions for failure to comply with LCR 10(e)(9), signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER renoting plaintiff's 10 MOTION to Remand ; Noting Date 8/25/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS) cc plaintiff
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within five days of the date of this Order, why she should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with Local Rule 10(e)(9), as to Plaintiff, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings(s) v. Duke Partners II, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Jennings(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Partners II, LLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Cutting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breckenridge Property Fund, LLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Cutting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wedgewood, LLC(s)
Represented By: Christopher D. Cutting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrus Parker
Represented By: Christopher D. Cutting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Shrader
Represented By: Barbara L Bollero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFRCT Law Firm
Represented By: Barbara L Bollero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo
Represented By: Barbara L Bollero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?