Microtouch, L.L.C. et al v. Paige Doyle et al

Plaintiff: Microtouch, L.L.C. and 30/10 Weight Loss, LLC
Defendant: Paige Doyle, Awaken 180 Inc, Newton Weightloss LLC, Peabody Weightloss LLC and Quincy Weightloss LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00996
Filed: June 30, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Noting Date for Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re parties' 90 Joint Stipulated MOTION. Noting Date for Defendants' 87 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is extended to 7/27/2018. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 89 ORDER granting parties' 86 Stipulated Motion. The deadline to complete deposition discovery is extended from 7/13/2018 to 8/3/2018. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 82 ORDER granting Defendants' 76 Motion to Quash Subpoena to Bundy Law Firm. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 64 ORDER directing parties to meet and confer within 7 days of this order re: Defendant's 59 MOTION to Compel Production. Parties are to notify the Court by telephone when that meet and confer has taken place. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 58 ORDER granting Counter Claimants'/Third Party Plaintiffs' 57 Motion for Extension of Time for Filing LCR 37 Submission, signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order 54 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 49 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs are directed to file the First Amended and Supplemental Complaint in the form attached to their motion. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order 47 AGREEMENT REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order 35 ORDER denying Defendants' 21 Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue. Venue is proper in this district and Defendants' motion to transfer the case to Massachusetts will be denied. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER granting plaintiffs' 10 Motion for Extension of Time; FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/15/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/22/2017, Joint Status Report due by 9/29/2017, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microtouch, L.L.C. et al v. Paige Doyle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microtouch, L.L.C.
Represented By: Noelle L Chung
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Janissa Ann Strabuk
Represented By: Bradley P Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 30/10 Weight Loss, LLC
Represented By: Noelle L Chung
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Janissa Ann Strabuk
Represented By: Bradley P Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paige Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Awaken 180 Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton Weightloss LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peabody Weightloss LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quincy Weightloss LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?