Quarterdeck Condominium Association of Apartment Owners v. Safeco Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Quarterdeck Condominium Association of Apartment Owners
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company, Diamond State Insurance Company, Royal Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Landmark Insurance Company of America, Commonwealth Insurance Company of America, Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Transnational Insurance Company, Gulf Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters of Lloyd of London and Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Case Number: 2:2017cv00999
Filed: June 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 37 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal. This stipulation is self-executing, and Defendant Commonwealth Insurance Company of America is DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying Defendant's 31 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. The Clerk and parties are DIRECTED to use the following case caption on all future filings: Quarterdeck Condominium Association of Apartment Owners v. Commonwealth Insurance Company of America. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 32 Stipulated Motion to Modify Expert Disclosure Deadlines and Extend Discovery Cutoff. The parties must disclose expert witnesses no later than July 30, 2018. The discovery cutoff is extended to August 13, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 27 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal of Defendant Landmark Insurance Company of America. The Court DISMISSES all claims against Defendant Landmark Insurance Company of America without prejudice and without an award of fees or costs to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 25 Stipulation and DISMISSES all claims against Defendant Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company without prejudice and without an award of attorney fees or costs to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 23 Stipulation and DISMISSES all claims against Defendant Arrowood Surplus Lines Insurance Company, formerly known as Royal Surplus Lines Insurance Company, without prejudice and without an award of attorney fees or costs to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 16 Stipulated Motion of Dismissal of Safeco. Having reviewed the parties' stipulation of dismissal and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the Court ORDERS that all of the claims set forth in the complaint shall be dismissed against Defendant Safeco Insurance Company without prejudice, and without costs to any party. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER dismissing all claims against Defendant Diamond State Insurance Company without prejudice, and without costs or attorney fees to any party; re parties' 13 Stipulation, authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)(Diamond State Insurance Company terminated.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quarterdeck Condominium Association of Apartment Owners v. Safeco Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quarterdeck Condominium Association of Apartment Owners
Represented By: Daniel S Houser
Represented By: Daniel Stein
Represented By: Justin D Sudweeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond State Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Stephania Camp Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transnational Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters of Lloyd of London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?