Rahman v. Chen et al
Plaintiff: Seeham Rahman
Defendant: Daphne Chen and Timothy Chen
Case Number: 2:2017cv01005
Filed: July 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 25 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal of All Claims with Prejudice. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Plaintiff's/Counter Defendant's 16 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. The claims are dismissed with prejudice and without leave to amend. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Judge James P. Donohue. (PM)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with leave to amend within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rahman v. Chen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seeham Rahman
Represented By: Gregory Hortman McLawsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daphne Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?