Progressive International Corporation v. Big Lots Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Progressive International Corporation
Defendant: Big Lots, Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01046
Filed: July 11, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 38 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice an d without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order 33 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Length of trial: 3-4 days; Jury Trial is set for 6/24/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15206 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Opening claim construction briefs due 9/7/2018, Responsive claim construction briefs due 9/24/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/3/2018, Discovery motions due by 1/10/2019, Discovery completed by 2/11/2019, Dispositive motions due by 3/7/2019, Motions in Limine due by 5/2 3/2019, Pretrial Order due by 6/7/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15206 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 1/3/2019, Trial briefs/Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 6/7/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 31 MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's 29 Unopposed Motion to Reopen Case; Joint Status Report due within thirty (30) days of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order 27 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having telephonically advised the Court that this matter has been resolved, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs. In the event settlement is not perfected, either party may move to reopen and trial will be scheduled, provided such motion is filed within 60 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 26 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 25 Joint Motion for Extension of Time: Opening claim construction briefs deadline EXTENDED to 4/30/2018, Responsive claim construction briefs deadline EXTENDED to 5/14/2018; striking Markman hearing scheduled for 6/5/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order 23 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 22 Stipulation, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order 20 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES: Amended Pleadings due by 4/12/2018, Opening claim construction briefs due 4/19/2018, Responsive claim construction briefs due 5/3/2018, Discovery completed by 10/11/2018, Dispositive m otions due by 11/8/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/3/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 12/29/2017, Reports from expert witnesses regarding Markman issues due 3/13/2018, Rebuttal expert reports regardi ng Markman issues due 3/27/2018, Motions due by 9/13/2018, Motions in Limine due by 1/10/2019, Pretrial Order due by 1/25/2019, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 9/4/2018, Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/25/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/25/2019, *Jury Trial* (5 days) is set for 2/11/2019 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Markman Hearing set for 6/5/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly, Pretrial Conference set for 2/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Substitute Party Defendant and Change Case Caption re parties' 15 Stipulation, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (Big Lots Stores, Inc added. Big Lots, Inc terminated.)(SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive International Corporation v. Big Lots Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive International Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence D Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Lots, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?