Rushforth Construction Co., Inc. v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Rushforth Construction Co., Inc.
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company, James River Insurance Company, Seneca Specialty Insurance Company, Gemini Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America, Ohio Security Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, New Hampshire Insurance Company and Wesco Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv01063
Filed: July 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 126 Stipulated Motion and Order Dismissing Defendants Arch Specialty Insurance Company and Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company with Prejudice. This stipulation is self-executing, and Defendants Arch Specialty Insurance Company and Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company are DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to either party. All Defendants have been dismissed in this matter. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 124 Stipulated Motion and Order Dismissing Defendants Ohio Security Insurance Company and The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company with Prejudice. This stipulation is self-executing, and Defendants Ohio Security Insurance Company and the Ohio Casualty Insurance Company are DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(TH)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 122 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendants New Hampshire Insurance Company and Wesco Insurance Company with Prejudice. This stipulation is self-executing, and Defendants New Hampshire and Wesco are DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 120 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant James River Insurance Company. This stipulation is self-executing, and Defendant James River is DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiff's 118 Notice of Settlement. Accordingly, Plaintiff's pending motion for partial summary judgment (Dkt. No. 107 ) is hereby STRIKEN. The parties are DIRECTED to submit a proposed order of dismissal upon finalizing the settlement. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 113 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendants Seneca Specialty Insurance Company, Gemini Insurance Company and United Specialty Insurance Company with Prejudice. Defendants Seneca Specialty Insurance Company, Gemini Insurance Company, and United Specialty Insurance Company are DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 79 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Wesco Insurance Company; denying Defendant Wesco's 83 Motion to Continue; denying Wesco's 86 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER. The Court hereby AMENDS its Minute Order dismissing Defendant Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America (Dkt. No. 69 ). The phrase "DISMISSED without prejudice" is replaced with "DISMISSED with prejudice," in accordance with the parties' stipulation and proposed order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER dismissing without prejudice defendant Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America per 68 Stipulation. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 66 Motion to Dismiss Party Scottsdale Insurance Company. Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company is DISMISSED without prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 59 STIPULATION. Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company shall have until November 6, 2017 to answer the complaint. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER to EXTEND deadline for all Defendants to answer the complaint, or otherwise respond, to 9/7/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER granting amended 26 stipulated motion to extend deadline for Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company to answer the complaint; deadline extended to 9/7/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 20 Stipulation Motion; James River Insurance Company shall have until 9/7/2017 to answer complaint, authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company's 14 motion to extend the deadline to answer the complaint; deadline extended to 8/24/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rushforth Construction Co., Inc. v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rushforth Construction Co., Inc.
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Represented By: Thomas M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Sekits
Represented By: Margaret M Van Valkenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Geoff J M Bridgman
Represented By: Daniel Francis Shickich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Kara Renee Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seneca Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemini Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Dirk Holt
Represented By: Miles J Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Sarah L Eversole
Represented By: Lisa C Neal
Represented By: John Michael Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Sarah L Eversole
Represented By: Jonathan Dirk Holt
Represented By: Lisa C Neal
Represented By: John Michael Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Hampshire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesco Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?