Blanchard v. North Cascade Trustee Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Annette Blanchard
Defendant: North Cascade Trustee Services Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Fidelity National Title Company of WA and Mortgage Electronic Registrations Systems Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01088
Filed: July 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re: Defendants Litton Loan Servicing LP, Mortgage Electronic Registrations Systems Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC.'s 32 Motion to Dismiss and re: Defendant North Cascade Trustee Services, Inc's 33 Joinder in Motion to Dismiss. D efendants have established firm bases for dismissal under FRCP 4(m), FRCP 12(b)(1),(b)(2) and (b)(5), and FRCP 12(b)(6). IT IS ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file signed waivers of service (or proof of service) with the Court by no later than February 6, 2018 or the Court will dismiss her matter for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiff within 14 days of this order to file proof of service in conformity with FRCP 4(l)(1). Failure to do so will result in dismissal as mandated by FRCP 4(m). Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Plaintiff to show cause within 14 days of this order why this matter should not be dismissed for failure to serve the Defendants within the statutory period. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Defendants to show cause by 12/4/2017 as to why they should not be held in contempt for failure to obey this Court's order 18 to file their Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) Modified on 11/27/2017: copy sent via first class mail to Plaintiff (PM).
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk to refrain from issuing summons, dismissing Ms. Blanchard's complaint 5 for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and granting leave to amend complaint; amended complaint due by 8/17/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: plaintiff via the U.S. Mail
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (PM) cc: plaintiff via the U.S. Mail
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanchard v. North Cascade Trustee Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Cascade Trustee Services Inc
Represented By: Nicolas A Daluiso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Laura Nichole Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Company of WA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registrations Systems Inc
Represented By: Laura Nichole Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?