Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Big 5 Corp.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Big 5 Corp
Movant: Robert J Sanders
Case Number: 2:2017cv01098
Filed: July 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Island
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing case with prejudice re 65 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER APPROVING CONSENT DECREE 63 signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. The Court, having considered the stipulated agreement of the parties, HEREBY ORDERS THAT the Consent Decree be, and the same hereby is, approved as the final decree of this Court in full settlement of this action. This lawsuit is hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorneys' fees. (PM)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying Plaintiff-Intervenor Robert Sanders' 48 Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 41 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff-Intervenor Robert Sanders' Emotional Distress Claims and Compel Production of 2012 Medical Admission Records. The Court declines to dismiss Plai ntiff's request for emotional distress damages. No later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Mr. Sanders shall produce the records related to his 2012 hospitalization at Compass Health in Mukilteo, WA. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REVISED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 37 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting Defendant's 20 Motion to Continue Trial. Jury Trial is RESET for 1/7/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S Martinez.The Clerk shall issue an Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 18 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Stipulated Motion to amend case title to reflect the addition of Robert Sanders as plaintiff-intervenor in this matter. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Robert J Sanders' 7 Motion to Intervene; the Court ORDERS Mr. Sanders to file and serve his proposed Complaint in Intervention within ten (10) business days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Big 5 Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Carmen Flores
Represented By: Roberta Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big 5 Corp
Represented By: Madeline J Engel
Represented By: Francis L VanDusen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Robert J Sanders
Represented By: Scott Glen Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?