Khazali v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Masoud Khazali
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2017cv01102
Filed: July 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Revoking In Forma Pauperis re 14 MOTION/REFERRAL NOTICE FROM NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff and Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order ; ORDER denying Plaintiff's 6 MOTION for Recusal ; signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Judge James L. Robart Judge Mary Alice Theiler. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via the U.S. Mail. Modified on 7/25/2017 to correct judge association (PM).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khazali v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masoud Khazali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?