Silcox v. AutoNation Inc et al

Plaintiff: Robert Silcox
Defendant: AN/PF ACQUISITION CORP.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01131
Filed: July 26, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial and Extend All Unexpired Pretrial Deadline. Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 2/4/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S Martinez; Discovery Motions due by 9/7/2018, Discovery completed by 10/8/20 18, Dispositive motions due by 11/5/2018, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 12/21/2018, Motions in Limine due by 1/7/2019, Agreed pretrial order due by 1/22/2019, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs/trial exhibits due by 1/28/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
April 3, 2018 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial and Extend All Unexpired Pretrial Deadlines; Jury Trial is continued to 11/5/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S Martinez; Discovery Motions due by 6/11/2018, Discovery completed by 7/ 9/2018, Dispositive motions due by 8/7/2018, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/24/2018, Motions in Limine due by 10/8/2018, Pretrial Order due by 10/23/2018, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 10/30/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
March 29, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant's 17 Motion for Protective Order and to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena to Ford Motor Company, Inc. Plaintiff's request for attorney's fees and costs is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
December 8, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re: 15 Stipulated MOTION for entry of protective order signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
August 21, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting parties' 11 Stipulated Motion to Vacate Order of Default Against Autonation Holding Corp., signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silcox v. AutoNation Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Silcox
Represented By: Wright A Noel
Represented By: Marina Visan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AN/PF ACQUISITION CORP.
Represented By: Ryan Paul Hammond
Represented By: Aurora Jane Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?