Winchester v. Obenland et al
Petitioner: Jeremiah Lance Winchester
Respondent: Obenland and Jackson
Case Number: 2:2017cv01136
Filed: July 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James P. Donohue
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING 34 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Petitioner's habeas petition is DENIED without an evidentiary hearing. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice. A certificate of appealability pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(3) is GRANTED as to Ground 2 (denial of right to retained counsel of choice) and DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting petitioner's 35 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Objections to Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting respondent's' 28 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: Deadline for respondent to file an answer to habeas corpus petition is extended to 4/15/2019, signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson.(SWT)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting parties' 25 Joint Motion to Lift Stay. Respondent shall file a response to petitioners habeas petition within 45 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (SWT)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting petitioner's 15 Amended Motion to Stay and Abey; petitioner and respondent are directed to notify this Court within 30 days after final resolution of petitioner's state post-conviction proceedings, signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (SWT)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER APPOINTING THE OFFICE OF THE FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER TO REPRESENT PETITIONER by Hon. James P. Donohue. (cc: petitioner via USPS)(ST)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. James P. Donohue.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jeremiah Winchester, Prisoner ID: 716971)(ST)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winchester v. Obenland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeremiah Lance Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Obenland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?