Holen et al v. Jozic et al
Plaintiff: Michael Holen
Defendant: Sasa Jozic, Jane Doe Jozic, Blue Land Transportation, Inc. and Coastal Pacific Xpress, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01147
Filed: July 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice an d without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (AD)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 38 Motion to Exclude BLT's Late-Named Expert Witnesses, and to Strike the Reports of Those Experts signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting Plaintiff Michael Holen's 34 Motion to take de bene esse depositions of medical witnesses. In addition, the court ORDERS the parties to complete all of these depositions no later than December 28, 2018. Any deposition that has not taken place by that time will not be considered as a de bene esse deposition. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting parties' 23 Stipulated Motion For Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff must file his amended complaint within three (3) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER re FRCP 35 Examination of Plaintiff per parties' 19 Stipulation. The Court ORDERS, that Alan Brown, MD, may examine Plaintiff on the terms and conditions set forth in the Stipulation between the parties. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting withdrawal and substitution of counsel re parties' 17 Stipulation. Dennis G. Woods of Scheer Law Group, LLP, hereby withdraws as counsel for Defendants Sasa Jozic and Jane Doe Jozic and Douglas Soderland of Law Offices of Douglas Soderland hereby substitutes as counsel for the same. Dennis G. Woods will remain on as counsel for Blue Land Transportation, Inc. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holen et al v. Jozic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Holen
Represented By: Glenn W Kadish
Represented By: Jeffrey Twersky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sasa Jozic
Represented By: Dennis G Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Jozic
Represented By: Dennis G Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Land Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis G Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Pacific Xpress, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?