160 Lee Street Condominium Homeowners' Association v. Mid-Century Insurance Company
Plaintiff: 160 Lee Street Condominium Homeowners' Association
Defendant: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv01170
Filed: August 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 27 Cross Motions for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 27 39 Motions to Strike. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER noting Defendant's 27 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment for 1/12/2018; Response to cross-motion due 1/8/2018; Reply to the 23 Motion and reply to the 27 cross motion due 1/12/2018. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Response due 1/5/2018; Reply due 1/12/2018. The 23 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is re-noted for 1/12/2018. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 20 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MODEL STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 160 Lee Street Condominium Homeowners' Association v. Mid-Century Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Francis J Maloney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 160 Lee Street Condominium Homeowners' Association
Represented By: Steven A Stolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?