Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company et al v. Push HDD, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company and The Hanover Insurance Company
Defendant: Push HDD, LLC, Reece Construction Company and The Tulalip Tribes of Washington
Case Number: 2:2017cv01174
Filed: August 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal re parties' 91 Stipulation; this matter is dismissed with prejudice as to all claims, with each party bearing its own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying Cross-Defendant Reece Construction Company's 54 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATED Limited Dismissal of Claims Against and Between Plaintiffs and Defendants Zurich American Insurance Company and Hudson Insurance Company re parties' 55 Stipulated Motion. Tt is hereby ORDERED that the claims assertedagainst and bet ween Plaintiffs MASSACHUSETTS BAY INSURANCE COMPANY and THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY and Defendants ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY and HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without fees or costs to any party. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re: 51 Stipulated Motion. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Push HDD, LLC., Reece Construction Company, and Hudson Insurance Company are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without fees or costs to any party. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 47 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Hudson Insurance Company to Respond to Second Amended Complaint. Defendant Hudson Insurance Company shall have up to and including May 25, 2018, to answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 45 Stipulated Motion to extend time for Hudson Insurance Company to respond to Zurich American Insurance Company's Cross Claim 37 . Deadline extended to 4/27/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 40 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Hudson Insurance Company to Respond to Zurich American Insurance Company's Cross Claim. Defendant Hudson Insurance Company shall have up to and including March 23, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company's Cross-Claim (Dkt. # 37 ). Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Hudson Insurance Company to Respond to Second Amended Complaint. Defendant Hudson Insurance Company shall have up to and including March 23, 2018, to answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Hudson Insurance Company shall have up to and including January 23, 2018, to answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Hudson Insurance Company shall have through and including January 16, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 22 Motion to File Second Amended Complaint. Second Amended Complaint due no later then three (3) business days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 7 Stipulated Motion Continuing Initial Scheduling Dates. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/1/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/8/2017, Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 10/15/2017, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company et al v. Push HDD, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Westin T McLean
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Westin T McLean
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Push HDD, LLC
Represented By: Angelia D Wesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reece Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Tulalip Tribes of Washington
Represented By: John Hitchcock Parnass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?