In re: Marat Timurshin

Appellant: Marat Timurshin
Appellee: Natalia Smagina and K Michael Fitzgerald
Case Number: 2:2017cv01189
Filed: August 7, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON APPEAL. Appellee's motion for attorney fees (Dkt. No. 19 ) is DENIED. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 23, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON APPEAL. The Bankruptcy Court's orders denying extension of automatic stay and denying motion for reconsideration are AFFIRMED. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 5, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying Appellant's 14 Ex Parte Motion to Continue an Appeal Hearing. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
December 19, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. Appellant is ORDERED to obtain and file a transcript of the July 6, 2017 hearing with the Clerk of Court no later than January 5, 2018. Appellant is further ORDERED to submit a paper copy of the record, including the above transcript, t o the Clerk of Court, attention the Honorable John C. Coughenour, no later than January 5, 2018. The Clerk is DIRECTED to renote Appellant's Bankruptcy Appeal (Dkt. No. 6 ) for January 19, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 18, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER directing the Appellant to provide the Court with a complete copy of the Bankruptcy Record on Appeal as it previously designated. (Dkt. No. 5-1 at 89.) Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Marat Timurshin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Marat Timurshin
Represented By: Olga Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Natalia Smagina
Represented By: Kathryn Scordato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: K Michael Fitzgerald
Represented By: Jason Wilson-Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?