Lo v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: |
Ka Wai Jimmy Lo |
Defendant: |
United States of America, United States Postal Service, Christian Tanuyan and Jane Doe Tanuyan |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01202 |
Filed: |
August 9, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Washington |
Office: |
Seattle Office |
County: |
King |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard A Jones |
Nature of Suit: |
Motor Vehicle |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1391 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 16, 2023 |
Filing
186
ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 182 Motion for the Court to Review of Taxation of Costs. The award of costs to the Government is reduced to a revised total of $3,205.51. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH)
|
February 15, 2023 |
Filing
174
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. The Court AWARDS Mr. Lo total overall damages of $204,296.20. The Court AWARDS Mr. Lo judgment against the Government, which shall be entered separately. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH)
|
June 16, 2022 |
Filing
160
ORDER re Parties' 159 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Post-Trial Deadlines. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and supplemental Trial Brief to be submitted by 6/24/2022, Defendant's objection to any evidence of back surgery due by 6/29/2022, Plaintiff's response to objection due by 7/5/2022. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH)
|
May 5, 2022 |
Filing
141
PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH)
|
April 5, 2022 |
Filing
129
ORDER Regarding the Parties' Daubert Motions and Motions in Limine. Plaintiff's motion to exclude the expert testimony of Drs. Dagher and Bays (Dkt. No. 65 ) is DENIED; the Government's motion to strike and exclude th e expert testimony of Ms. Johnson (Dkt. No. 69 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Plaintiff's motions in limine (Dkt. No. 99 ) are DENIED; and the Government's motions in limine (Dkt. No. 101 ) are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH)
|
March 30, 2022 |
Filing
128
ORDER Regarding Judicial Settlement Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff, Plaintiff and Counsel for Defendant are ORDERED TO APPEAR: 4/13/2022 at 9:30 am. Each party shall email a separate settlement memo to Judge Tsuchida's in-court clerk by 1:00 pm on 4/8/2022. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (MW)
|
March 21, 2022 |
Filing
125
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 117 Motion to Amend the Claim Amount. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH)
|
March 4, 2022 |
Filing
116
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 94 Motion to Amend, without prejudice. Should Plaintiff choose to move to amend one final time, Plaintiff shall re-move to amend his claim amount within five (5) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH)
|
February 7, 2022 |
Filing
114
ORDER granting Plaintiff Counsel Reid's 110 Corrected Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH)
|
November 12, 2021 |
Filing
93
ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 57 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff may file an amended motion consistent with this Order within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (SR)
|
November 4, 2021 |
Filing
92
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 63 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (SR)
|
November 3, 2021 |
Filing
91
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 71 Motion to Exclude and Strike Expert Opinions of Sanford Wright, M.D. The Court STRIKES Dr. Wright's supplemental report in its entirety. The Court EXCLUDES the following o pinions: 1. Dr. Wright's opinions regarding the reasonableness and necessity of Plaintiffs medical bills; 2. Dr. Wright's opinions regarding Plaintiff's alleged hip injury and mental health condition; 3. Dr. Wright 9;s opinions regarding Plaintiff's alleged Complex Regional Pain Syndrome; and 4. Dr. Wright's opinions regarding the causation between Plaintiff's alleged hip injury, mental health condition, and Complex Regional Pain Syndrome. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (SR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?