Meyer et al v. Bayerische Motoren Werke AG et al
Plaintiff: Howard J Meyer, Jr and Darlis L Elliott
Defendant: Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, BMW of North America, LLC and DMC Sidecars LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01218
Filed: August 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER regarding 72 75 Motions in Limine. The Court hereby finds and ORDERS that the motions in limine (Dkts. # 72 and # 75 ) are GRANTED, DEFERRED, and DENIED as stated herein. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting Defendants' 65 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot Defendants' 66 Motion in Limine; denying as moot Defendants' 74 Motion in Limine. All of Plaintiffs' claims asserted against Defendants Bayerische Motoren Werke AG and BMW of North America, LLC in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Personal Injury and Property Losses (Dkt. # 23 ) are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiffs' 63 Request for Information from the Court. Plaintiffs' filing does not establish good cause for an alteration of the Court's scheduling order as any conflict with the existing trial date is speculati ve. Should the parties, jointly or singularly, determine that a conflict exists that requires alteration of the Court's schedule, the Court will entertain stipulated or opposed motions. Absent further filings, the Court will take no further action with regard to Plaintiffs' Request for Information from the Court (Dkt. # 63 ). Authorized by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting the parties' 61 Joint Stipulated Motion to (A) Substitute the Defendants' Medical Expert Witness, and (B) Adjust Related Deadlines. Deadline to Depose Plaintiff' s Treating Surgeon is 8/27/2021, Deadline to Amend Expert Reports is 9/30/2021, Expert Discovery Cutoff is 10/29/2021, Dispositive motions due by 10/29/2021. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(PM)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting Parties' 59 Stipulated Motion. The Court resets the trial date and related deadlines as follows: Jury Trial is set for 1/10/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Fact Discovery completed by 6/25/2021, Amended Ex pert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/30/2021, Expert discovery completed by 9/10/2021, Dispositive motion filing deadline is 10/15/2021, Motions in Limine due by 12/9/2021, Responses to Motions in Limine 12/20/2021, Agreed Pr etrial Order lodging date is 12/29/2021, proposed voir dire questions/jury instructions/trial briefs/neutral statement of the case/trial exhibits due by 12/31/2021. Defendant BMW AG's and BMW NA's Motions in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence (Dkt. # 50 ); Defendant DMC Sidecars LLCs Motions in Limine (Dkt. # 53 ); and Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine (Dkt. # 55 ) are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LH)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 56 Unopposed Motion to Allow One Day Extension to File Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting Defendants BMW of North America, LLC, Bayerische Motoren Werke AG's 47 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorneys Philip Douglas House and Jofrey M McWilliam. Attorneys Philip Randolph Meade and Peter Steilberg terminated. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(MW)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re parties' 45 Joint Stipulated Motion to extend the time for disclosing expert reports. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/18/2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting parties' 43 Joint Motion For a Continuance. Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 3/16/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/18/2019, Discovery Motions due by 10/18/2019, Discovery completed by 11/18/2019, Dispositive motions due by 12/17/2019, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 1/31/2020, Motions in Limine due by 2/17/2020, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 3/4/2020, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 3/11/2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER striking at this time the parties' 41 Joint Motion and Stipulation for a Continuance of the Trial Date and Expert Disclosure Deadline. The Court will not vacate the trial date without setting a new trial date and does not believe t hat a status conference with the Court is necessary to set a new trial date. Nothing in this Minute Order prevents the parties from refiling their request for a continuance of the trial date to a date the parties believe the case will be ready for trial or from requesting modifications to the Court's current scheduling order. Authorized signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER extending deadline re parties' 39 Joint Motion for Extension of Time: Expert Witness Disclosure Reports due by 10/22/2018, signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re: 37 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/24/2018, Discovery Motions due by 10/24/2018, Discovery completed by 11/23/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 35 Stipulation, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 12 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; Plaintiff shall file their previously lodged amended complaint, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 8 9 Joint Motions for Extension of Time; FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/20/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/27/2017, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 11/4/2017, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer et al v. Bayerische Motoren Werke AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayerische Motoren Werke AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Philip Randolph Meade
Represented By: Peter Steilberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMC Sidecars LLC
Represented By: Michael G Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard J Meyer, Jr
Represented By: Michael William Flanigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlis L Elliott
Represented By: Michael William Flanigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?