Thomas et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cecil Thomas and Pamela Thomas
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Services LLC, Deutsch Bank National Trust Company and Quality Loan Service Corp
Case Number: 2:2017cv01222
Filed: August 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Dismissal and Release of Funds Held in Court Registry re parties' 61 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT) (cc: Finance)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting in part parties' 56 Joint Motion to Continue Trial Date and Related Deadlines. **Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 10/15/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Discovery completed by 4/5/2019, Dispositive motions due by 7/17/2019, Motions in Limine due by 9/17/2019, Pretrial Order due by 10/3/2019, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 10/10/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting parties' 48 Joint Motion to Extend SettlementConference Deadline and Discovery Deadline. Settlement Conference set for 2/8/2019 before Hon. James P. Donohue. Discovery completed by 3/8/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Judge Donohue
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants Ocwen's and Deutsche's 25 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiffs may file an Amended Complaint no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Should Plaintiffs choose not to file such a complaint, their current Claims Three, Five and Six will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. The Clerk is directed to strike the November 20, 2017, hearing date on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction and on the show cause return for the Temporary Restraining Order; Order Noting Motion for Preliminary Injunction entered September 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 16 Stipulated Motion to extend TRO and continue hearing on preliminary injunction; Preliminary Injunction Hearing continued to 11/20/2017 at 10:00 AM signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and Order to Show Cause re Plaintiffs' 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2017 at 12:00 PM before Judge Ricardo S Martinez. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Thomas
Represented By: Keith D Karnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Thomas
Represented By: Keith D Karnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Services LLC
Represented By: Thomas N Abbott(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kristine E Kruger
Represented By: Cody M Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsch Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?