Montague v. Safeway, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Desiree A Montague
Defendant: Safeway Inc and Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01241
Filed: August 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice and without costs re parties' 21 Joint Motion, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed under FRCP 25(a). Show Cause Response due by 7/27/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' 8 Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiff's remaining claims are dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend no later than 4/6/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 14 Stipulation, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montague v. Safeway, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree A Montague
Represented By: Thomas G Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?