January 12, 2023 |
Filing
171
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal re Parties' 170 Stipulated MOTION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action, including all claims, counterclaims and crossclaims as to Plaintiffs Olympic Air, Inc. and Catlin Insurance Company, Inc. and Defendants Helicopter Technology Company LLC and Helicopter Corporation, are DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs or fees to either party. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
|
October 13, 2022 |
Filing
169
FIFTH AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & RELATED DATES: 10-Day Jury Trial is set for 9/11/2023 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Discovery completed by 4/7/2023, Settlement conference to be held by 4/21/2023, Dispositive motions due by 5/8/2023, Motions in Limine due by 7/31/2023, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 8/23/2023, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 9/6/2023. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
|
October 7, 2022 |
Filing
167
ORDER denying Defendants' 122 Motion to Stay Discovery Order. HTC shall immediately produce all outstanding trade secret discovery to plaintiffs. Discovery is reopened and must be completed by 4/7/2022. The Court will issue an updated Case Management Order accordingly. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
|
March 18, 2022 |
Filing
165
ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 137 Cross Motion to Strike. The Court hereby STRIKES: The NTSB Report (Dkt. # 119 -1); Paragraphs 21 and 25 of the Declaration of Dr. Burdorf (Dkt. # 120 at 21, 25). Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
|
March 17, 2022 |
Filing
163
FOURTH AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & RELATED DATES re Parties' 162 Stipulated MOTION. 10-day Jury Trial is set for 3/6/2023 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Motions in Limine due by 2/6/2023, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 2/22/2023, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs/trial exhibits due by 3/1/2023. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
|
September 27, 2021 |
Filing
157
ORDER ON REED PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS. The Reed plaintiffs' motion to dismiss their claims against HTC with prejudice and enter judgment dismissing their claims (Dkt. # 155 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment dismissing with prejudice all claims by the Reed plaintiffs against HTC, with each side bearing its own costs. Claims by Olympic Air, Inc., and Catlin Insurance Company, Inc. are not dismissed. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
|
October 30, 2020 |
Filing
117
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: HTC's "Motion to Dismiss" (Dkt. # 60 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' first and second "Joint Motions for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint" (Dkts. # 69 , # 101 ) are GRANTED. Plaintiffs&# 039; "Motion to Compel Defendant [HTC] to Answer Interrogatories and Produce Documents" (Dkt. # 65 ) is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that HTC produce documents responsive to plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production Nos. 1-4 , 6-7, 9-11, 13- 19, and 21-41, and fully answer plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories Nos. 2-13 and 15-16 within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiffs' first "Pro Forma Motion for LCR 5(g) Review of Documents Designated Confidential by Defendant HTC" (Dkt. # 81 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs' second "Pro Forma Motion for LCR 5(g) Review of Documents Designated Confidential by Defendant HTC" (Dkt. # 90 ) is also GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The parties are ordered to meet and confer regarding limited redaction of Exhibits A, C, D, and E in accordance with this Order. Redacted versions of the exhibits, including plaintiffs' revised SAC, shall be filed within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to unseal Dkt. # 94 (Ex. B). The Court has not considered the Cepus Declaration in the disposition of this matter and finds it unnecessary to rule on the merits of defendants' "Motion to Strike Declaration of Elvis Cepus" (Dkt. # 110 ). Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
|
January 31, 2020 |
Filing
108
ORDER granting Parties' 107 Stipulated Motion to Stay: All activity in these consolidated cases is stayed for a period of sixty (60) days. This stay includes, without limitation, all deadlines, discovery, briefing, hearing, decisions, and orders. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
|
November 4, 2019 |
Filing
96
ORDER denying Reed Plaintiffs' 57 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
|
October 3, 2019 |
Filing
63
PROTECTIVE ORDER re Parties' 62 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
|
May 29, 2019 |
Filing
55
ORDER granting Defendant's 47 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
|
May 7, 2018 |
Filing
44
ORDER granting plaintiffs' 42 Motion for Leave to Amend First Consolidated Complaint for Damages, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
|
March 21, 2018 |
Filing
40
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION granting parties' 35 Joint Motion to Consolidate cases; striking without prejudice Defendant MD Helicopters Inc.'s 10 Motion to Dismiss. All documents hereafter filed in these causes shall be filed and docketed under Case No. C17-1257RSL. Plaintiffs are ordered to meet and confer and within fourteen days of this order file a Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
|
February 2, 2018 |
Filing
38
ORDER re parties' 36 Stipulated Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Attorney Andrew D. Barr terminated.)
|
November 21, 2017 |
Filing
28
ORDER on parties' 27 Stipulated Motion on Briefing Schedule; RENOTING defendant's 11 MOTION to Dismiss : Noting Date 1/19/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
|
September 11, 2017 |
Filing
16
ORDER on parties' 15 Stipulated Motion to Stay Initial Case Scheduling Deadlines. All deadlines set in the Court's Order Regarding Initial Disclosures, Joint Status Report, and Early Settlement, Dkt. # 13 , are STAYED. A new Order Regarding Initial Disclosures, Joint Status Report, and Early Settlement shall issue following entry of an Order on MDHI's Motion to Dismiss, Dkt. # 11 . Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
|