A.Z. v. Regence BlueShield et al
Plaintiff: A. Z.
Defendant: Regence BlueShield and Cambia Health Solutions Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01292
Filed: August 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re: Plaintiff's 60 Notice of Settlement. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion Re: Notice of Settlement is GRANTED and no notice of settlement or dismissal shall be required to be distributed to members of the putative class. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER SETTING DATES AND DEADLINES re parties' 58 Stipulation: Bench Trial (4 days) is set for 8/26/2019 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/1/2019, Dispositive motion s and/or any motion related to class certification due by 5/9/2019, Motions in Limine due by 7/25/2019, Pretrial Order due by 8/9/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 8/12/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER denying Defendants' 51 Motion for Reconsideration authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER renoting defendants' 51 MOTION for Reconsideration : Noting Date 9/14/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re defendants' 40 Motion to Dismiss; denying defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's first claim; granting defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's second claim; denying defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's third and fourth claims. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 42 Stipulated Motion Regarding Briefing Schedule; RENOTING defendants' 40 MOTION to Dismiss : Noting Date 5/25/2018. The Court RESETS the following deadlines: Bench Trial (4 days) is set for 3/25/2019. Dispositive motions due by 12/7/2018, Motions in Limine due by 2/21/2019, Pretrial Order due by 3/8/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2019 at 01:30 PM. Trial briefs to be submitted by 3/8/2019, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 3/8/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting Defendants' 38 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading. Defendants have until April 20, 2018 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Scope of Discovery re parties' 34 Stipulation, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss; The Complaint, dkt. 1 , is DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to refile within thirty (30) days of this Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Stipulated Motion to file administrative record under seal. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 27 Stipulation, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES: **Bench Trial** (4 days) is set for 2/4/2019 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Motions due by 2/22/2018, Dispositive motions due by 6/7/2018, Pretrial Order due by 1/18/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/18/2019, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 1/18/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Stipulated Motion Regarding Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's 15 MOTION to Dismiss is RENOTED for 11/10/2017. Response due 11/3/2017; Reply due on or before the new noting date. Authorized signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or File a Responsive Pleading. The deadline for defendants to file a responsive pleading is EXTENDED from September 19, 2017, to October 10, 2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.Z. v. Regence BlueShield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. Z.
Represented By: Eleanor Hamburger
Represented By: Jordan Matthew Lewis(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Richard E Spoonemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regence BlueShield
Represented By: Medora A Marisseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambia Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Medora A Marisseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?