Emiabata et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA/JP Morgan Chase (SLS) et al
Plaintiff: Philip Emiabata and Sylvia Emiabata
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA/JP Morgan Chase (SLS), JP Morgan Chase Bank/BSI Financial and Avail 1. LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01302
Filed: August 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing Plaintiffs' complaint without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(h)(3) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: plaintiffs via first class mail
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiffs' 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. James P. Donohue.(RS) cc plaintiffs
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with leave to amend. Plaintiffs have 30 days to correct deficiency. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (PM) cc: order and blank IFP application, written consent sent to plaintiffs via the USPS.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emiabata et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA/JP Morgan Chase (SLS) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Emiabata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Emiabata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA/JP Morgan Chase (SLS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank/BSI Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avail 1. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?