Carr v. State of Washington
Petitioner: Peter James Carr
Respondent: State of Washington
Case Number: 2:2017cv01326
Filed: September 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying Petitioner's 36 Motion for Reconsideration and denying as moot Petitioner's 39 Motion requesting response. The Court will not accept any further filings in this closed case. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter Carr, Prisoner ID: 357101) (TH)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying Petitioner's Motions (Dkt. ## 32 , 33 ), and DECLINES to issue a certificate of appealability (Dkt. # 34 ). Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter Carr, Prisoner ID: 357101) (TH)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 28 ; denying Petitioner's 29 Objection; dismissing the habeas petition with prejudice and declining to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter Carr, Prisoner ID: 357101)(PM)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting Petitioner Leave to File a Second Amended Habeas Petition. The Court GRANTS Petitioner leave to file, within 30 days of the date of this Order, an amended habeas petition that adds any additional claims he intended to raise. The Clerk is directed to RE-NOTE respondent's answer, Dkt. 22 , for 30 days from the date of this order, send petitioner the proper forms so he may file a second amended petition. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter Carr, Prisoner ID: 357101) (TH) (cc: Petitioner a blank 2254 Petition via U.S. Mail)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER. Petitioner filed a letter expressing concern that parts of his amended petition are illegible.Dkt. 16 . The Court has reviewed the amended petition and found it legible. Authorized by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter Carr, Prisoner ID: 357101)(TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peter James Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?