Jiao v. Blumenthal et al
Plaintiff: Jie Jiao
Defendant: Connie Blumenthal, John Doe Blumenthal and Realogics Brokerage LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01355
Filed: September 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice and without an award of costs to any party; re parties' 49 Stipulation. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Wei Fan and Maoqi Zhang's 48 Motion to Dismiss Counter-Claim. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to docket the proposed revised First Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 30 at 4-18) within ten (10) days of this order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 21 Stipulation. The law firm of Lane Powell PC is granted leave to withdraw as attorneys of record for Defendant Blumenthal, effective immediately. J. Dino Vasquez of Karr Tuttle Campbell shall be substituted as counsel of record for Defendant Blumenthal. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jiao v. Blumenthal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jie Jiao
Represented By: Katie J Comstock
Represented By: David M Von Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Blumenthal
Represented By: Rachel Greenlee
Represented By: Katie Belinda Smith Matison
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Blumenthal
Represented By: Rachel Greenlee
Represented By: Katie Belinda Smith Matison
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realogics Brokerage LLC
Represented By: Rachel Greenlee
Represented By: Katie Belinda Smith Matison
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?