Mays v. Bishop et al
Plaintiff: David E. Mays
Defendant: Hans E. Bishop, Richard D. Klausner, Robert T. Nelsen, Howard H. Pien, Hal V. Barron, Thomas O. Daniel, Anthony B. Evnin, Mary Agnes Wilderotter, Marc Tessier-Lavigne and Steven D. Harr
Case Number: 2:2017cv01356
Filed: September 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Stipulated Motion Voluntarily Dismissing Action Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING OUTCOME OF ANNOUNCED ACQUISITION OF DEFENDANT JUNO THERAPEUTICS, INC. signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. The briefing schedule on Defendants' 28 Motion to Transfer is vacated; All other pretrial proceedings are stayed. (PM)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Consolidate Related Actions and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel re parties' 10 Stipulation; The files of the Consolidated Derivative Action will be maintained in one file underLead Case No. 2:17-cv-1356-RSM, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: consolidation of case with 16-cv-1069 RSM. Parties Responses due no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TOCOMPLAINT, VACATE DISCOVERY DEADLINES, AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO TRANSFER. Defendants shall file their motion to transfer on or before November 17, 2017, Plaintiff shall file his opposit ion to the motion to transfer on or before January 2, 2018, and Defendants shall file their reply on or before February 1, 2018. Defendants' deadline to file a motion to dismiss or other responsive pleading will be postponed until such time as t he Court has ruled on the motion to transfer. After the Court rules on the motion to transfer, Plaintiff and Defendants shall promptly meet and confer regarding a schedule for Defendants' anticipated motion(s) to dismiss the Complaint in either this Court or the transferee court in the District of Delaware. The discovery deadlines set forth in the Order Regarding Initial Disclosures, Joint Status Report, and Early Settlement (Docket # 7 ), including the November 9, 2017 deadline to submit a Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan, are vacated. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. Bishop et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E. Mays
Represented By: Dan Drachler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hans E. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Klausner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert T. Nelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard H. Pien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hal V. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas O. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony B. Evnin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Agnes Wilderotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Tessier-Lavigne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven D. Harr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?