Diffley v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Brett Diffley
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington and Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01370
Filed: September 11, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 33 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
April 11, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants Nationstarand Wells Fargo's 24 Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
March 30, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DATES signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. Jury Trial is set for 11/19/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S Martinez, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/14/2018, Discovery Motions due by 6/18/2018, Discovery completed by 7/16/2018, Dispositive motions due by 8/13/2018, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/28/2018, Motions in Limine due by 10/15/2018, Pretrial Order due by 11/1/2018, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 11/8/2018. (PM)
December 6, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants Nationstar and Well Fargo's 11 Motion to Dismiss; denying Defendant QLS's Joinder in the 13 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diffley v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Diffley
Represented By: Vicente Omar Barraza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Represented By: Michael J Kapaun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington
Represented By: Robert W McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Represented By: Michael J Kapaun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?