Wells Fargo Insurance Services USA, Inc v. Ogden et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Insurance Services USA, Inc
Defendant: Stanley Ogden, Marcia Ogden, Eleanor O'Keefe, Lewis Dorrington, John Haskell, Jr, Mary Mark and ABD Insurance and Financial Services, Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01394
Filed: September 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting Parties' 178 Joint Stipulated MOTION Regarding Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (SB)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting Parties' 198 Joint Stipulated MOTION. Jury Trial is continued to 3/1/2023 before Judge Stanley A. Bastian in Seattle, Washington. The hearing scheduled on 1/23/2023 is STRICKEN. The deadline for both parties to file objections to witness and exhibit lists is extended to 1/25/2023. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (LH)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 THIRD AMENDED JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial (5 days) is set for 2/28/2023 at 09:00 AM in Seattle before Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Seattle before Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Exhibit and Wi tness Lists due by 1/17/2023, Pretrial Exhibit Stipulation due by 1/31/2023, Cross-Designations of Testimony due by 1/9/2023, Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/31/2023, Trial briefs and voir dire to be submitted by 2/1/2023, Proposed jury instructions due by 1/31/2023. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (MW)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER Striking Trial Date and Remaining Pretrial Deadlines. The June 14, 2022 trial date is STRICKEN. A new trial date will be set after the parties confer and submit their unavailable dates to the Court by May 13, 2022. All remaining pretrial deadlines are STRICKEN. Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Pretrial Conference, ECF No. 183 , is GRANTED. The pretrial conference set for June 6, 2022 is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (LH)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER denying Defendants' 167 Motion for Relief from Expert Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (LH)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 SECOND AMENDED JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial is set for 6/14/2022 in Seattle at 09:00 AM before Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2022 in Seattle at 09:00 AM before Judge Stanley A. Bastian, Motions in Limine du e by 5/3/2022, Exhibit and Witness Lists due by 5/10/2022, Pretrial Exhibit Stipulation due by 5/24/2022, Designation of Testimony due by 4/29/2022, Pretrial Order due by 5/24/2022, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 5/20/2022. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (MW)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER denying Defendants' 143 Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Experts Peter Nickerson & R. Bryan Tilden. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian.(LH)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 AMENDED JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial is set for 8/23/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Counsel estimates a trial length of five days. Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley A. Bastian, Motions in Limine due by 7/12/2021, Exhibit and Witness Lists due by 7/19/2021, Pretrial Exhibit Stipulation due by 8/2/2021, Designation of Testimony due by 7/9/2021, Pretrial Order due by 8/2/2021, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 7/29/2021. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (MW)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER striking Defendants' 122 Motion in Limine, with leave to renew; striking Plaintiff's 124 Motion in Limine, with leave to renew. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian.(MW)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Clarifying 128 Summary Judgment Order; re defendants ABD and John Haskell, Jr.'s 129 Motion. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff USI Insurance Services National, Inc.'s 70 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part defendants' 75 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER awarding fees and costs re defendant ABD Insurance & Financial Services, Inc.'s 103 Motion. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff USI Insurance Services National Inc.'s 44 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendants, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying plaintiff USI Insurance Services National, Inc.'s 49 Motion to Continue Case management Deadlines, with the exception of leave to conduct Mr. Tilden's deposition at a mutually agreeable time. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 39 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 LETTER FROM COURT re parties' 37 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Court is declining to sign. (SWT)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting parties' 25 Stipulated Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint.
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting parties' 19 Stipulated Motion to Extend Initial Disclosure Deadline; Initial Disclosure Deadline is EXTENDED to 11/3/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Insurance Services USA, Inc v. Ogden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Insurance Services USA, Inc
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Holt
Represented By: James G Zissler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Ogden
Represented By: Justo Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Ogden
Represented By: Justo Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleanor O'Keefe
Represented By: Justo Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Dorrington
Represented By: Justo Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Haskell, Jr
Represented By: Justo Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Mark
Represented By: Justo Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABD Insurance and Financial Services, Inc
Represented By: Jaime Cuevas, Jr.
Represented By: Justo Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?