Butler et al v. Chadeayne, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Susan J. Butler and Patrick J Butler
Defendant: Chadeayne, LLC and Andrew R. Chadeayne
Case Number: 2:2017cv01443
Filed: September 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER granting in part defendants' 40 Motion to Modify Case Schedule: Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) deadline is EXTENDED to 5/30/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 34 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for defendants to file a responsive pleading or motion is EXTENDED to December 8, 2017. Although the Notice of Removal indicates that plaintiff Susan B utler's middle initial is "J," the pleading filed by plaintiffs in state court in Missouri states that Susan Butler's middle initial is "L." See Ex. A to Notice of Removal (docket no. 1 -1). The Clerk is DIRECTED to modify the docket accordingly. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (ECF No. 13 ) GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Chadeayne Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (ECF No. 6 ) is DENIED as MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/21/2017. (NEB) [Transferred from moed on 9/22/2017.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler et al v. Chadeayne, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan J. Butler
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Alex R Lumaghi(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michael Barry Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick J Butler
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Alex R Lumaghi(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michael Barry Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chadeayne, LLC
Represented By: William A Brasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew R. Chadeayne
Represented By: William A Brasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?