King v. Northwest Trustee Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Barbara M. King
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services Inc, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Does 1-100
Case Number: 2:2017cv01448
Filed: September 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Defendants Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.'s 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants SPS and the Trust are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. Mail)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE regarding subject matter jurisdiction; the court ORDERS Ms. King to provide additional information regarding the basis for the court's subject matter jurisdiction; response must be no longer than five (5) pages and filed within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (PM) cc: plaintiff via the U.S. Mail
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Northwest Trustee Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara M. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Represented By: Heather S. Moore Paradis
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Heather S. Moore Paradis
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?