Smith v. Phillips et al
Plaintiff: |
Robert H. Smith |
Defendant: |
Ryan W. Phillips, Robert Cracchilo, J. Seth, Lee Malkow, Emergy, Malkow, Snohomish County Sherrifs Office, Washington State and Mark Zuckerburg |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01457 |
Filed: |
September 25, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Washington |
Office: |
Seattle Office |
County: |
King |
Presiding Judge: |
Mary Alice Theiler |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas S. Zilly |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 30, 2019 |
Filing
92
ORDER ADOPTING 91 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Defendants' motions for summary judgment (Dkts. 74 and 79 ) are GRANTED, Plaintiffs' second amended complaint (Dkt. 11 ) and this action are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)(cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
|
April 12, 2019 |
Filing
89
ORDER granting Snohomish County defendants' 72 Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Cut-Off Date; denying defendants Cracchilo and Seth's 73 Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Cut-Off Date; RENOTING defendants' motions for summary judgment (Dkts. 74 , 79 ) re parties' 88 Stipulated Motion : Noting Date 4/26/2019. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
|
January 14, 2019 |
Filing
71
ORDER denying plaintiffs' 66 Motion to Exclude Depositions. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
|
November 28, 2018 |
Filing
65
ORDER granting in part plaintiffs' 54 Motion to Modify Pretrial Schedule; EXTENDING discovery deadline to 1/18/2019 and dispositive motion deadline to 2/19/2019 ; denying plaintiffs' 55 Motion for Sanctions Under FRCP 11(b) ; denying plaintiffs' 56 Motion to Amend Complaint ; denying plaintiffs' 58 Motion for Sanctions Under FRCP 37(b)(2). Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
|
October 17, 2018 |
Filing
52
ORDER denying Plaintiff Smith's 45 Motion for Separate Representation; ; striking Plaintiff Smith's 51 Motion to Amend Second Amended Complaint and 47 Motion to Modify Prescheduling Order; extending Discovery deadline to 11/19/2018 and Dispositive deadline to 12/19/2018, signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(SWT) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
|
June 13, 2018 |
Filing
39
ORDER denying plaintiffs' 31 Motion for Alternative Dispute Resolution; striking plaintiffs' 32 Motion for Service of Complaint on Everett Police Department Employees; striking plaintiffs' 34 Motion for Discovery; striking plaintiffs' 37 Notice and Claim for Equal Rights, signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (SWT)
|
March 27, 2018 |
Filing
21
ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS FROM CIVIL RIGHTS ACTION signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Report and Recommendation is approved and adopted. Plaintiffs' second amended complaint (Dkt. 11) and this action are DISMISSED with prejudice as to defendants Snohomish County Sheriff's Office and Mark Zuckerberg. Plaintiffs' retaliation, unlawful arrest and detention, and equal protection claims are DISMISSED without prejudice.Judge Theiler shall issue a service order directing service of plaintiffs' second amended complaint on Snohomish County Sheriff's Deputies Phillips, Cracchilo, Seth, Malkow, Emery and Vargas. (cc: plaintiffs)(ST)
|
October 6, 2017 |
Filing
6
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR COURT-APPOINTED COUNSEL by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: plaintiff)(ST)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?