The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company v. Ridgway et al

Plaintiff: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Claudia Ridgway, Joseph M Gonzales, Amanda Gonzales, Bethany Kristiansen and Estate of Joseph B. Gonzales
Case Number: 2:2017cv01490
Filed: October 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Skagit
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 49 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Remaining Counterclaims with Prejudice and Disburse Interpleader Funds. Ms. Ridgway's counterclaim against Lincoln National is dismissed with prejudice; the clerk is authorized and directed t o draw a check(s) on the funds deposited in the registry of this Court in the principal amount of $257,295.72 plus all accrued interest, minus any statutory users fees, payable to Attorney Tom Seguine in Trust for Claudia Ridgway. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: finance
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying as moot Plaintiff's 44 Motion to stay all discovery deadline. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER directing Defendant Claudia Ridgway to respond to Plaintiff's 41 MOTION for Reconsideration. Response due 3/21/2018; no reply to be filed. Plaintiff's 41 MOTION for Reconsideration is re-noted for 3/23/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Judgment In Interpleader. Plaintiff shall deposit the subject funds into the registry of the Court. Defendant Claudia Ridgway's 20 Motion to Extend Time For Filing Answer is granted in part and denied in part as moot. Defendant Claudia Ridgway's 14 Motion for Summary Judgment Dismissal is granted. All claims and cross-claims made by Defendants Joseph M. Gonzales, Amanda Gonzales, Bethany Kristiansen an d Estate of Joseph Gonzales are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, and those Co-Defendants are now DISMISSED from this case. This case remains OPEN pending resolution of Ms. Ridgway's Counterclaim. No other claims remain. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: finance

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company v. Ridgway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Rahn Bentson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Ridgway
Represented By: Thomas E Seguine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethany Kristiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Joseph B. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?